HB0535 (CH0430)

Find a 2015 Bill:

2015 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Blind or Visually Impaired Children - Individualized Education Programs - Orientation and Mobility Instruction

Sponsored by:

Delegate Turner

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/11/20152/11/2015First Reading Ways and Means
2/13/20152/13/2015Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2/20/20152/20/2015Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
3/20/20153/20/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/20/20153/19/2015Favorable with Amendments {665269/1 Report Adopted49
Second Reading Passed with Amendments49
3/23/20153/21/2015Third Reading Passed (135-5)51
Senate3/23/20153/20/2015First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs47A
4/9/20154/9/2015Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/10/20154/3/2015Favorable Report Adopted61
Second Reading Passed61
4/11/20154/4/2015Third Reading Passed (45-0)62
House4/13/20154/7/2015Returned Passed68
Post Passage5/12/20155/12/2015Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:42 P.M.