HB0548 (CH0333)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Prekindergarten Student Assessment

Sponsored by:

Delegate Shoemaker

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 333


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/30/20171/30/2017First Reading Ways and Means
2/1/20172/1/2017Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
4/6/20174/6/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/6/20173/30/2017Favorable with Amendments {295769/1 Report Adopted64
Second Reading Passed with Amendments64
4/7/20173/31/2017Third Reading Passed (135-0)65
Senate4/10/20174/2/2017First Reading Senate Rules62
4/10/20174/10/2017Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/10/20174/4/2017Favorable Report Adopted64
Second Reading Passed64
Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted64
Third Reading Passed (44-1)64
House4/10/20174/5/2017Returned Passed70
Post Passage4/18/20174/18/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 333

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:01 P.M.