HB0616 (CH0729)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Pregnant and Parenting Students - Attendance Policy

Sponsored by:

Delegate Atterbeary

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 729


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/30/20171/30/2017First Reading Ways and Means
2/1/20172/1/2017Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
3/6/20173/6/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/7/20173/7/2017Favorable with Amendments {465466/1 Report Adopted40
Special Order until 3/08 (Delegate Aumann) Adopted 40
3/8/20173/8/2017Floor Amendment {843526/1 (Delegate Aumann) Rejected (52-85)41
Second Reading Passed with Amendments41
3/10/20173/10/2017Third Reading Passed (125-13)43
Senate3/13/20173/13/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs42
4/3/20174/3/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/20173/29/2017Favorable with Amendments {444532/1 Report Adopted58
Second Reading Passed with Amendments58
4/5/20173/30/2017Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)59
House4/8/20174/1/2017House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments66
House Requests Senate Recede66
Senate4/10/20174/3/2017Motion Recede (Senator Pinsky) Adopted63A
Senate Recede63A
Third Reading Passed (36-0)63A
House4/10/20174/5/2017Returned Passed70
Post Passage5/25/20175/25/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 729

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:01 P.M.