HB0631 (CH0818)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public Health - Essential Off-Patent or Generic Drugs - Price Gouging - Prohibition

Sponsored by:

Speaker

Status:

Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 818


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/30/20171/30/2017First Reading Health and Government Operations and Economic Matters
2/8/20172/8/2017Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
3/20/20173/20/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
3/20/20173/16/2017Favorable with Amendments {376789/1 Report Adopted50
Second Reading Passed with Amendments50
3/20/20173/17/2017Third Reading Passed (137-4)51
Senate3/21/20173/19/2017First Reading Finance48
3/22/20173/22/2017Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20174/5/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
4/5/20173/30/2017Favorable with Amendments {247274/1 Report Adopted59
Special Order until 4/6 (Senator Feldman) Adopted 59
4/6/20173/31/2017Floor Amendment {943322/2 (Senator Jennings) Adopted60
Second Reading Passed with Amendments60
4/7/20174/1/2017Floor Amendment {683326/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (13-32)61
Floor Amendment {893327/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (14-31)61
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (38-7)61
House4/10/20174/2/2017House Concur - Senate Amendments67
Third Reading Passed (137-2)67
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/27/20175/27/2017Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 818

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 30, 2017 12:54 P.M.