HB0739 (CH0612)

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session



Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit

Sponsored by:



Approved by the Governor - Chapter 612

ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/3/20142/3/2014First Reading Ways and Means
2/12/20142/12/2014Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
3/6/20143/6/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Favorable with Amendments {335969/1 Report Adopted42
Second Reading Passed with Amendments42
3/7/20143/7/2014Third Reading Passed (119-14)43
Senate3/10/20143/7/2014First Reading Budget and Taxation41A
3/12/20143/12/2014Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
3/14/20143/14/2014Hearing cancelled
3/19/20143/19/2014Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
3/19/20143/14/2014Favorable Report Adopted48
Second Reading Passed48
3/20/20143/15/2014Third Reading Passed (36-10)49
House3/21/20143/18/2014Returned Passed54
Post Passage5/15/20145/15/2014Approved by the Governor - Chapter 612

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions

May 15, 2014 11:38 A.M.