HB1004

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Maryland Civil Air Patrol

Sponsored by:

Delegate Cardin

Status:

In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/8/20132/8/2013First Reading Ways and Means
2/13/20132/13/2013Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
4/3/20134/3/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/3/20133/28/2013Favorable with Amendments {205669/1 Report Adopted61
Second Reading Passed with Amendments61
4/4/20133/29/2013Third Reading Passed (137-0)62
Senate4/4/20133/30/2013First Reading Senate Rules61A
4/5/20134/5/2013Rereferred to Budget and Taxation

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:04 P.M.