HB1342 (CH0525)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

State Government – Discrimination and Harassment

Sponsored by:

Delegate Kelly

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 525


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/9/20182/9/2018First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2/21/20182/21/2018Hearing 3/05 at 3:00 p.m.
3/16/20183/16/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
3/16/20183/13/2018Favorable with Amendments {583221/1 Report Adopted47
Floor Amendment {663926/1 (Delegate Healey) Adopted47
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47
3/19/20183/15/2018Third Reading Passed (138-0)49
Senate3/19/20183/16/2018First Reading Senate Rules48B
3/29/20183/29/2018Hearing 3/30 at 11:00 a.m.
Hearing canceled
Hearing 3/30 at 12:30 p.m.
4/5/20184/5/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Senate Rules
4/5/20183/31/2018Favorable with Amendments {573720/1 Report Adopted62A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments62A
4/6/20184/1/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)63
House4/9/20184/2/2018House Concur - Senate Amendments67
Third Reading Passed (140-0)67
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/8/20185/8/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 525

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 8, 2018 1:34 P.M.