HB1400 (CH0307)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program – Employees of Qualifying Organizations

Sponsored by:

Delegate Morhaim

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 307


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/9/20182/9/2018First Reading Appropriations
2/12/20182/12/2018Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2/14/20182/14/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 3/01 at 1:15 p.m.
3/16/20183/16/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
3/16/20183/13/2018Favorable with Amendments {884463/1 Report Adopted47
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47
3/19/20183/14/2018Third Reading Passed (137-0)48
Senate3/19/20183/16/2018First Reading Budget and Taxation48B
3/23/20183/21/2018Reassigned to Finance52
3/26/20183/26/2018Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20184/5/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
4/5/20183/31/2018Favorable with Amendments {447279/1 Report Adopted62A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments62A
4/6/20184/1/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)63
House4/7/20183/31/2018House Concur - Senate Amendments65
Third Reading Passed (138-0)65
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage4/24/20184/24/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 307

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 24, 2018 2:56 P.M.