HB1432 (CH0570)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Health Care Providers - Prescription Opioids - Limits on Prescribing (The Prescriber Limits Act of 2017)

Sponsored by:

Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 570


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/10/20172/10/2017First Reading Health and Government Operations
2/15/20172/15/2017Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
3/31/20173/31/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
3/31/20173/27/2017Favorable with Amendments {526580/1 Report Adopted61
Second Reading Passed with Amendments61
4/4/20173/28/2017Third Reading Passed (139-0)62
Senate4/5/20173/30/2017First Reading Senate Rules59
4/5/20174/6/2017Rereferred to Finance
4/6/20174/6/2017Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Hearing canceled
4/6/20173/31/2017Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs60
4/6/20174/6/2017Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
4/7/20174/7/2017Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/10/20174/2/2017Favorable Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed62
4/10/20174/3/2017Third Reading Passed (47-0)63A
House4/10/20174/4/2017Returned Passed69
Post Passage5/25/20175/25/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 570

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 25, 2017 12:50 P.M.