HB1443

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission Reform Act

Sponsored by:

Delegate Glenn

Status:

In the House - House Concur - Senate Amendments


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/10/20172/10/2017First Reading Health and Government Operations
2/15/20172/15/2017Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
3/31/20173/31/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
3/31/20173/27/2017Favorable with Amendments {766389/1 Report Adopted61
Special Order until 04/03 (Delegate Ghrist) Adopted 61
4/3/20173/27/2017Floor Amendment {133720/1 (Delegate Glenn) Adopted61A
Floor Amendment {583529/1 (Delegate Glenn) Adopted61A
Floor Amendment {113221/1 (Delegate Ghrist) Adopted61A
Floor Amendment {913725/1 (Delegate Ghrist) Rejected (46-86)61A
Floor Amendment {433129/1 (Delegate Aumann) Rejected (46-84)61A
Floor Amendment {343520/1 (Delegate Fisher) Rejected (51-82)61A
Floor Amendment {823723/1 (Delegate B. Wilson) Rejected (53-78)61A
Floor Amendment {733626/1 (Delegate Grammer) Rejected (47-86)61A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments61A
4/4/20173/28/2017Third Reading Passed (90-45)62
Senate4/5/20173/30/2017First Reading Senate Rules59
4/5/20174/5/2017Rereferred to Finance
4/10/20174/10/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
4/10/20174/2/2017Favorable with Amendments {487771/1 Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed with Amendments62
4/10/20174/3/2017Floor Amendment {273623/1 (Senator Feldman) Adopted63A
Floor Amendment {463624/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (13-34)63A
Floor Amendment {903320/1 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted63A
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (34-13)63A
House4/10/20174/4/2017House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments69
House Requests Senate Recede69
Conference Committee Appointed69
Delegates Rosenberg, Pena-Melnyk, and Kipke69
Senate4/10/20174/3/2017Senate Refuses to Recede63A
House4/10/20174/5/2017House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments70
House Requests Senate Recede70
Senate4/10/20174/4/2017Senate Refuses to Recede64
House4/10/20174/5/2017House Concur - Senate Amendments70
Motion vote previous question (Delegate B. Barnes) Adopted (84-51)70

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 5, 2017 9:11 A.M.