HB1480 (CH0592)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Controlled Dangerous Substances - Distributors - Reporting Suspicious Orders

Sponsored by:

Speaker

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 592


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/9/20182/9/2018First Reading Health and Government Operations
2/14/20182/14/2018Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
3/16/20183/16/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
3/16/20183/13/2018Favorable with Amendments {526989/1 Report Adopted47
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47
3/19/20183/15/2018Third Reading Passed (138-0)49
Senate3/19/20183/16/2018First Reading Judicial Proceedings48B
3/30/20183/30/2018Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/30/20183/27/2018Favorable Report Adopted58
Second Reading Passed58
4/2/20183/28/2018Third Reading Passed (46-0)59
House4/3/20183/25/2018Returned Passed59
Post Passage5/15/20185/15/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 592

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 15, 2018 1:16 P.M.