SB0029 (CH0794)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Natural Resources - Forest Conservation Act - Forest Conservation Thresholds and Afforestation and Reforestation Requirements

Sponsored by:

Senator Pinsky

Status:

Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 794


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate7/27/20167/27/2016Pre-filed
1/11/20171/11/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/4/20171/4/2017Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
1/27/20171/27/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/30/20171/30/2017Favorable with Amendments {274038/113
Laid Over (Senator Norman) Adopted13
1/31/20171/31/2017Favorable with Amendments {274038/1 Report Adopted14
Second Reading Passed with Amendments14
2/2/20172/2/2017Third Reading Passed (40-5)16
House2/3/20172/3/2017First Reading Environment and Transportation18
3/6/20173/6/2017Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
4/6/20174/6/2017Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
4/6/20173/30/2017Favorable Report Adopted64
Second Reading Passed64
4/8/20174/1/2017Special Order until later today (Delegate Barve) Adopted 66
Special Order until 04/10 (Delegate Moon) Adopted 66
4/10/20174/2/2017Special Order until next session (Delegate Moon) Adopted 67
4/10/20174/3/2017Third Reading Passed (137-3)68
Senate4/10/20174/4/2017Returned Passed64
Post Passage5/27/20175/27/2017Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 794

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:08 P.M.