SB0042 (CH0436)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

State Government - Commemorative Days - Maryland Emancipation Day

Sponsored by:

Senator Montgomery

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 436


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate4/20/20124/20/2012Pre-filed
1/9/20131/9/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/20131/16/2013Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
3/27/20133/27/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/20133/23/2013Favorable with Amendments {134639/1 Report Adopted54
Second Reading Passed with Amendments54
3/28/20133/24/2013Third Reading Passed (46-0)55
House3/29/20133/25/2013First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations58
4/6/20134/6/2013Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
4/8/20134/8/2013Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
4/8/20134/3/2013Favorable Report Adopted67
Second Reading Passed67
4/8/20134/5/2013Third Reading Passed (133-0)69
Senate4/9/20134/7/2013Returned Passed69
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 436

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:07 P.M.