SB0049

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Maryland State Song - Revision

Sponsored by:

Senator Young

Status:

In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate7/10/20157/10/2015Pre-filed
1/13/20161/13/2016First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/6/20161/6/2016Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/14/20163/14/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/20163/15/2016Favorable with Amendments {264339/144
Laid Over (Senator Cassilly) Adopted44
3/16/20163/16/2016Favorable with Amendments {264339/1 Report Adopted45
Second Reading Passed with Amendments45
3/17/20163/17/2016Third Reading Passed (38-8)46
House3/17/20163/15/2016First Reading Health and Government Operations47
3/28/20163/28/2016Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 28, 2016 12:16 P.M.