SB0187 (CH0010)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2018

Sponsored by:

President

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 10


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/17/20181/17/2018First Reading Budget and Taxation
2/7/20182/7/2018Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/12/20183/12/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Favorable with Amendments {399834/144
Motion to Suspend Rule 52 (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted44
Laid Over (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted44
3/13/20183/13/2018Favorable with Amendments {399834/145
Special Order until 3/14 (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted 45
3/14/20183/14/2018Favorable with Amendments {399834/146
Committee Amendment (#1-4) Adopted46
Committee Amendment (#5-13) Adopted46
Committee Amendment (#14-20) Adopted46
Committee Amendment (#21-25) Adopted46
Committee Amendment (#26-30) Adopted46
Committee Amendment (#31-37) Adopted46
Committee Amendment (#38-43) Adopted46
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted46
Floor Amendment {133923/1 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted46
Second Reading Passed with Amendments46
3/15/20183/15/2018Third Reading Passed (45-0)47
House3/15/20183/12/2018First Reading Appropriations46
3/19/20183/19/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
3/19/20183/15/2018Favorable with Amendments {694263/149
Special Order until 3/21 (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted 49
3/21/20183/17/2018Favorable with Amendments51
Favorable with Amendments {694263/151
Committee Amendment (#1) Adopted51
Committee Amendment (#2) Adopted51
Committee Amendment (#3-4) Adopted51
Committee Amendment (#5) Adopted51
Committee Amendment (#6) Adopted51
Committee Amendment (#7) Adopted (84-50)51
Committee Amendment (#8-14) Adopted51
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted51
Floor Amendment {373625/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (47-86)51
Second Reading Passed with Amendments51
3/22/20183/18/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (94-42)52
Senate3/23/20183/21/2018Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments52
Senate Requests House Recede52
Conference Committee Appointed52
Senators Kasemeyer, DeGrange, Madaleno, King, and Edwards52
Senate advisors:52
(Senators McFadden, Ferguson and Serafini)52
House3/23/20183/18/2018House Refuses to Recede52A
Conference Committee Appointed52A
Delegates McIntosh, Gaines, Jones, Reznik, and Beitzel52A
House advisors:52A
(Delegates Haynes and Kaiser)52A
Senate3/27/20183/23/2018Conference Committee Report Adopted54
Third Reading Passed (47-0)54
House3/27/20183/20/2018Conference Committee Report Adopted54A
Third Reading Passed (100-38)54A
Senate3/27/20183/23/2018Passed Enrolled
Post Passage4/5/20184/5/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 10

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 5, 2018 10:56 A.M.