SB0261

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted Regulations

Sponsored by:

Senator Young

Status:

In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/18/20131/18/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings
1/23/20131/23/2013Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs10
1/30/20131/30/2013Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/11/20133/11/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Favorable with Amendments {294630/1 Report Adopted42
Second Reading Passed with Amendments42
3/13/20133/13/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)44
House3/13/20133/13/2013First Reading Health and Government Operations46
3/20/20133/20/2013Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:08 P.M.