SB0429

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Higher Education - Student Loan Notification Letter

Sponsored by:

Senator Klausmeier

Status:

Veto sustained (0-44)


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/27/20171/27/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
2/2/20172/2/2017Hearing canceled
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
3/16/20173/16/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Favorable with Amendments {404133/1 Report Adopted45
Second Reading Passed with Amendments45
3/17/20173/17/2017Third Reading Passed (46-0)46
House3/17/20173/14/2017First Reading Appropriations48
3/22/20173/22/2017Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/31/20173/31/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
3/31/20173/27/2017Favorable with Amendments {824362/1 Report Adopted61
Second Reading Passed with Amendments61
4/4/20173/28/2017Third Reading Passed with Amendments (132-6)62
Senate4/10/20174/2/2017Senate Concur - House Amendments62
Third Reading Passed (46-0)62
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/26/20175/26/2017Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Senate1/12/20181/12/2018Veto sustained (0-44)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


January 12, 2018 3:29 P.M.