SB0503 (CH0175)

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session



Public Schools - Cardiopulmonary Resuscitation and Automated External Defibrillator Instruction (Breanna's Law)

Sponsored by:

Senator Pugh


Approved by the Governor - Chapter 175

ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/28/20141/28/2014First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/20141/29/2014Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
3/3/20143/3/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/4/20143/4/2014Favorable with Amendments {274739/1 Report Adopted38
Second Reading Passed with Amendments38
3/6/20143/6/2014Third Reading Passed (44-0)40
House3/7/20143/7/2014First Reading Ways and Means43
3/14/20143/14/2014Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
3/31/20143/31/2014Favorable Report by Ways and Means
4/1/20143/25/2014Favorable Report Adopted61
Second Reading Passed61
4/3/20143/27/2014Third Reading Passed (137-0)63
Senate4/4/20143/26/2014Returned Passed60
Post Passage4/14/20144/14/2014Approved by the Governor - Chapter 175

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions

October 24, 2017 1:56 P.M.