SB0545

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Legislative Immunity - Prosecutions for Bribery

Sponsored by:

Senator Frosh

Status:

In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/1/20132/1/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings
2/6/20132/6/2013Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
3/21/20133/21/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/21/20133/19/2013Favorable Report Adopted50
Second Reading Passed50
3/25/20133/21/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)52
House3/26/20133/22/2013First Reading Judiciary55A
3/26/20133/26/2013Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:09 P.M.