SB0656 (CH0516)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Calvert County - Property Tax - Natural Gas Facility

Sponsored by:

Senator Miller

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 516


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/1/20132/1/2013First Reading Budget and Taxation
2/13/20132/13/2013Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
3/11/20133/11/2013Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
3/12/20133/12/2013Favorable43
Special Order until 3/13 (Senator Dyson) Adopted 43
3/13/20133/13/2013Favorable Report Adopted44
Floor Amendment (Senator Dyson) {223220/1 Adopted44
Second Reading Passed with Amendments44
3/15/20133/15/2013Third Reading Passed (41-0)46
House3/18/20133/15/2013First Reading Ways and Means48A
3/20/20133/20/2013Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/29/20133/29/2013Favorable Report by Ways and Means
3/29/20133/25/2013Favorable Report Adopted58
Second Reading Passed58
4/4/20133/29/2013Third Reading Passed (136-0)62
Senate4/4/20133/30/2013Returned Passed61A
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 516

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 18, 2013 4:07 P.M.