SB0701 (CH0329)

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Children With Disabilities - Habilitative Services Information

Sponsored by:

Senator Madaleno

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 329


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/31/20141/31/2014First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
3/3/20143/3/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/4/20143/4/2014Favorable with Amendments {424237/1 Report Adopted38
Second Reading Passed with Amendments38
3/6/20143/6/2014Third Reading Passed (44-0)40
House3/7/20143/7/2014First Reading Ways and Means43
3/14/20143/14/2014Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
3/31/20143/31/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/1/20143/25/2014Favorable with Amendments {655566/1 Report Adopted61
Second Reading Passed with Amendments61
4/3/20143/27/2014Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)63
Senate4/4/20143/26/2014Senate Concur - House Amendments60
Third Reading Passed (47-0)60
Passed Enrolled60
Post Passage5/5/20145/5/2014Approved by the Governor - Chapter 329

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:56 P.M.