SB0897 (CH0329)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Consumer Protection - Security Freezes - Children in Foster Care Settings

Sponsored by:

Senator Klausmeier

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 329


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/11/20132/11/2013First Reading Senate Rules
2/20/20132/20/2013Rereferred to Finance
2/22/20132/22/2013Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
3/22/20133/22/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
3/22/20133/20/2013Favorable with Amendments {657072/1 Report Adopted51
Second Reading Passed with Amendments51
3/25/20133/21/2013Third Reading Passed (46-0)52
House3/26/20133/22/2013First Reading Economic Matters55A
4/1/20134/1/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
4/1/20133/26/2013Favorable with Amendments {593190/1 Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed with Amendments59
4/4/20133/29/2013Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0)62
Senate4/4/20133/30/2013Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments61A
Senate Requests House Recede61A
Conference Committee Appointed61A
Senators Klausmeier, Kittleman, and Garagiola61A
House4/8/20134/3/2013House Refuses to Recede67
Conference Committee Appointed67
Delegates Jameson, Haddaway-Riccio, and Schulz67
Senate4/8/20134/6/2013Conference Committee Report Adopted68
Third Reading Passed (45-0)68
House4/8/20134/5/2013Conference Committee Report Adopted69
Third Reading Passed (136-0)69
Senate4/8/20134/7/2013Passed Enrolled69
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 329

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:10 P.M.