SB1029 (CH0339)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Maryland Agricultural Certainty Program

Sponsored by:

Senator Middleton

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 339


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/26/20132/26/2013First Reading Senate Rules
3/6/20133/7/2013Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/8/20133/8/2013Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
3/21/20133/21/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/20133/19/2013Favorable with Amendments {384732/150
Laid Over (Senator Raskin) Adopted50
3/22/20133/20/2013Favorable with Amendments {384732/1 Report Adopted51
Motion Special Order until 3/25 (Senator Forehand) Rejected (12-33)51
Floor Amendment (Senator Middleton) {313422/1 Adopted51
Floor Amendment (Senator Glassman) {123622/1 Adopted51
Second Reading Passed with Amendments51
3/25/20133/21/2013Third Reading Passed (38-9)52
House3/26/20133/22/2013First Reading Environmental Matters55A
3/26/20133/26/2013Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
3/27/20133/27/2013Hearing cancelled
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20134/5/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
4/5/20133/31/2013Favorable with Amendments {840917/1 Report Adopted64
Special Order until later today (Delegate Mizeur) Adopted 64
Floor Amendment (Delegate Mizeur) {413521/1 Rejected64
Floor Amendment (Delegate Mizeur) {793725/1 Rejected (17-115)64
Floor Amendment (Delegate Cardin) {143726/1 Rejected64
Floor Amendment (Delegate Frick) {373829/2 Rejected (15-112)64
Second Reading Passed with Amendments64
4/6/20134/1/2013Third Reading Passed with Amendments (105-27)65
Senate4/8/20134/4/2013Senate Concur - House Amendments66
Third Reading Passed (37-10)66
Passed Enrolled66
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 339

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 18, 2013 4:07 P.M.