HB0778

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums

Sponsored by:

Delegate Hubbard

Status:

In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.


Synopsis:Altering a limitation on claiming the income tax credit for eligible long-term care insurance premiums for more than 1 year with respect to the same insured individual; altering the amount of the credit from a one-time $500 credit to a credit of $250 for taxable years beginning January 1, 2015 and January 1, 2016, and $500 for the taxable year beginning January 1, 2017 and each taxable year thereafter; requiring a public awareness campaign; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2014.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates Hubbard, Afzali, Aumann, Barkley, Barnes, Barve, Bates, Boteler, Cullison, Elliott, Frank, Frush, Gaines, George, Guzzone, Holmes, Hough, Howard, Impallaria, Ivey, Kaiser, A. Kelly, Kramer, Krebs, Luedtke, McConkey, A. Miller, Myers, Nathan-Pulliam, Niemann, O'Donnell, Pena-Melnyk, Proctor, Ready, Serafini, Smigiel, Sophocleus, Summers, Valentino-Smith, Walker, and Wood
Additional Facts:Introduced in a prior session as: HB0578 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Committee(s):
Ways and Means   View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Taxes - Income
Narrow Subject(s):Advertising
Health Insurance -see also- HMOS; Managed Care Organizations
Income Tax
Insurance Administration
Long-Term Care -see also- Continuing Care; Nursing Homes
Public Information
Tax Credits -see also- Circuit Breaker
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:51 P.M.