SB0842

Find a 2015 Bill:

2015 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

St. Mary's County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption

Sponsored by:

Senator Waugh

Status:

In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules


Synopsis:Exempting from the St. Mary's County property tax specified personal property purchased by businesses during the period from July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2018; exempting specified personal property from the St. Mary's County property tax beginning on July 1, 2018; providing that specified personal property remains subject to the St. Mary's County property tax; etc.
Analysis:Not available at this time
All Sponsors:Senator Waugh
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0184
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Committee(s):
Rules
Broad Subject(s):Taxes - Property - Local
Narrow Subject(s):Cable Television
Equipment -see also- Motor Vehicle Equipment
Exemptions
Local Government Mandates
Personal Property
Property Tax
Railroads
Reports
St. Mary's County
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Utilities -see also- High Voltage Lines; Telephones; Water
Statutes:Article - Tax - Property
(7-402)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 20, 2015 7:26 P.M.