Counties - Generally (L1)

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 13

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0277Municipalities - Authority to Serve Citations for Violations of County LawsDelegate TarlauIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0442
    (SB0303)
Counties - Transportation Adequate Public Facility Law - State Highway IntersectionDelegate BromwellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0577
    (SB0431 / CH0206)
Allegany County and Garrett County - Annual Financial Reports - Filing DateAllegany County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0598Alcoholic Beverages - Distribution and Sales Tax RevenuesDelegate FrickIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
HB0736Labor and Employment - Employment Rights for Local Government Employees - EstablishmentDelegate TarlauIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0851Counties - Paid Sick Leave for Limited-Term Grant-Funded Employees - RequirementDelegate HealeyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1025Prince George's County - Land Use - Zoning Powers and Review PG/MC 111-16Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
HB1027Prince George's County - Land Use Permit Review - Consolidation PG/MC 110-16Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
HB1121
    (SB0012)
Health Care Facilities - Closures or Partial Closures of Hospitals - County Board of Health ApprovalDelegate Pena-MelnykIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0012
    (HB1121)
Health Care Facilities - Closures or Partial Closures of Hospitals - County Board of Health ApprovalSenator RosapepeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0303
    (HB0442)
Counties - Transportation Adequate Public Facility Law - State Highway IntersectionSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Finance
SB0431 / CH0206
    (HB0577)
Allegany County and Garrett County - Annual Financial Reports - Filing DateSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 206Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
SB1134Criminal Procedure - Initial Appearance Before a District Court Commissioner - Costs for Appointed Legal RepresentationSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:03 P.M.