Counties - Generally (L1)

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 17

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0334 / CH0414
    (SB0573 / CH0415)
Local Government - Regulation of Animals - Kennel LicensesDelegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 414Environment and Transportation
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0357Expungement - Fee - Baltimore City Consent DecreeDelegate ConawayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0583
    (SB0421)
Counties - Historic Preservation - Development LimitationDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Hearing canceledEnvironment and Transportation
HB0708 / CH0551State Department of Education - Lacrosse Opportunities Program - Youth Lacrosse Nonprofit OrganizationsDelegate WalkerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 551Ways and Means
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0852 / CH0483Courts - Action for Violation of Collective Bargaining Agreement or Breach of Duty of Fair Representation - Limitations PeriodDelegate BarkleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 483Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0854Units of State Government - Award of Grants to Counties - Requirement of Paid Sick LeaveDelegate HealeyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0947Vehicle Laws - Vehicle Presence Monitoring Systems - Authorization by Local JurisdictionsDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
HB1168 / CH0618
    (SB0957 / CH0619)
Counties and Municipalities - Land Bank AuthoritiesDelegate HolmesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 618Environment and Transportation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1300 / CH0419Charles County - Garbage Disposal Services - Provider DisplacementCharles County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 419Environment and Transportation
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1320 / CH0735Southern Maryland Code Counties - Towing Companies - Authority to RegulateCharles County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 735Environment and Transportation
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1370Labor and Employment - Employment Rights for Local Government Employees - EstablishmentDelegate Young, P.In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0214Local Government - Public Nuisances - Restriction on Local "Padlock" LawsSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0352Calvert County - Calvert County Youth Recreational Opportunities Fund - Uses and Funding ExtensionCalvert County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0421
    (HB0583)
Counties - Historic Preservation - Development LimitationSenator PetersIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0573 / CH0415
    (HB0334 / CH0414)
Local Government - Regulation of Animals - Kennel LicensesSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 415Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0957 / CH0619
    (HB1168 / CH0618)
Counties and Municipalities - Land Bank AuthoritiesSenator EckardtApproved by the Governor - Chapter 619Budget and Taxation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
SB1027 / CH0482Courts - Action for Violation of Collective Bargaining Agreement or Breach of Duty of Fair Representation - Limitations PeriodSenator MannoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 482Finance
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:15 P.M.