Apprentices

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 15

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0465"EARN" Apprenticeships (Expand Apprenticeship Resources Now Act)Delegate McCrayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0467 / CH0782
    (SB0699)
Providing Our Workers Education and Readiness (POWER) - Apprenticeship ActDelegate McCrayEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 782Economic Matters
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Capital Budget (B5)
HB0630Education - On-the-Job Pilot ProgramDelegate GrammerIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0652
    (SB0335)
Career Apprenticeship Opportunity Act of 2017Delegate McCrayIn the House - Referred to interim study by Ways and MeansWays and Means
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0810 / CH0257Apprenticeships - Apprenticeship and Training Council - RevisionsChair, Economic Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 257Economic Matters
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0848
    (SB0678)
Community Colleges - Vocational Certificates, Apprenticeship Training Programs, and Associate's Degrees - Tuition AssistanceDelegate SteinIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB1210Procurement - Prevailing Wage Rates - Applicability to Sheet Metal FabricatorsDelegate FrickIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB1384Task Force to Study Implementing the German Academic-Apprenticeship Model for Adults Without a High School EducationDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1470Apprenticeship and Training Council - Apprentice Ratios - Electrical Craft or TradeDelegate McCrayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1512
    (SB0942)
Labor and Employment - Clean Energy Workforce Account - EstablishmentDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/6/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0317 / CH0149
    (HB0394)
More Jobs for Marylanders Act of 2017PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 149Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0335
    (HB0652)
Career Apprenticeship Opportunity Act of 2017Senator RosapepeIn the House - Rereferred to Economic MattersFinance
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Economic MattersPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0678
    (HB0848)
Community Colleges - Vocational Certificates, Apprenticeship Training Programs, and Associate's Degrees - Tuition AssistanceSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Higher Education (F2)
SB0699
    (HB0467 / CH0782)
Providing Our Workers Education and Readiness (POWER) - Apprenticeship ActSenator RosapepeIn the House - Second Reading PassedFinance
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Economic MattersCapital Budget (B5)
SB0942
    (HB1512)
Labor and Employment - Clean Energy Workforce Account - EstablishmentSenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:57 A.M.