Attorney General

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 28

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0140State Government - Open Meetings Act - PenaltyDelegate O'DonnellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0220Voters' Rights Protection Act of 2013Delegate RosenbergIn the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)Ways and Means
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Elections (G1)
HB0291 / CH0465
    (SB0383 / CH0464)
Real Property - Maryland Mortgage Assistance Relief Services ActSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 465Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0296
    (SB0305 / CH0224)
Division of Labor and Industry and Associated Boards and Councils - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationChair, Economic Matters CommitteeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0318Labor and Employment - Labor Organizations - Right to WorkDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0332
    (SB0185)
Public Safety - Emergency Management - Essential Goods and ServicesDelegate Pena-MelnykIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceEconomic Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0334 / CH0295
    (SB0589 / CH0294)
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Rental-Purchase TransactionsDelegate Washington, M.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 295Economic Matters
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB0441Courts - Death Penalty CourtDelegate ImpallariaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/14/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0475Public School Labor Relations - Renegotiation Procedures and Board AdministrationChair, Ways and Means CommitteeIn the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
HB0484Maryland Open Meetings Act - Enforcement AuthorityDelegate BoboIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0509Maryland False Claims Act of 2013Delegate AroraIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0589Firearms Freedom ActDelegate DwyerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryPublic Safety (E4)
HB0713 / CH0636Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture - Property Used in Human TraffickingDelegate DumaisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 636Judiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0876Child Abuse - Failure to Report - Civil Penalty, Fund, and Task ForceDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1312
    (SB0456)
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection ActDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1499 / CH0419
    (SB1039)
Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 419Ways and Means
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
SB0185
    (HB0332)
Public Safety - Emergency Management - Essential Goods and ServicesSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0210Elected Officials - Civil Cases - Liability for Costs, Judgments, and Settlements (Taxpayer Protection Act of 2013)Senator SimonaireIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
SB0234Office of the Attorney General - Establishment of a Consumer Affairs Satellite Office in Prince George's CountySenator CurrieIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB0305 / CH0224
    (HB0296)
Division of Labor and Industry and Associated Boards and Councils - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 224Finance
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0374 / CH0246
    (HB0316)
Office of the Attorney General - Workgroup on Children's Online Privacy ProtectionSenator AstleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 246Finance
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCommercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB0376Public Safety - Emergency Management - Essential Goods and ServicesSenator KingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinancePublic Safety (E4)
SB0383 / CH0464
    (HB0291 / CH0465)
Real Property - Maryland Mortgage Assistance Relief Services ActSenator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 464Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Environmental Matters
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Real Property (N1)
SB0456
    (HB1312)
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection ActSenator ReillyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0589 / CH0294
    (HB0334 / CH0295)
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Rental-Purchase TransactionsSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 294Finance
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCommercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB0668Labor and Employment - Right to WorkSenator KittlemanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0727Members of the General Assembly - Whistleblower ProtectionSenator MuseIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesState Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB1039
    (HB1499 / CH0419)
Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013PresidentIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsElections (G1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.