Open Government

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 13

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0169
    (SB0091)
State Board of Elections - Open Meetings - Audio Recordings and Documents (State Board of Elections Transparency Act)Delegate KormanIn the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth and Government Operations
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
HB0438
    (SB0253)
Legislative Transparency Act of 2017SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Health and Government Operations
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0880 / CH0525
    (SB0450 / CH0526)
Open Meetings Act - Annual Reporting Requirement, Web Site Postings, and TrainingDelegate MoralesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 525Health and Government Operations
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0909
    (SB0571 / CH0017)
Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection ActDelegate Pena-MelnykIn the Senate - Rereferred to FinanceHealth and Government Operations
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
FinanceInsurance - Health (C3)
HB0933General Assembly - Live and Archived Video Streaming of MeetingsDelegate SzeligaIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB1134 / CH0781
    (SB0884 / CH0018)
Maryland Financial Consumer Protection CommissionDelegate FrickEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 781Economic Matters
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB1541
    (SB0910 / CH0509)
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - OperationsDelegate BrooksIn the House - Rereferred to Economic MattersEconomic MattersInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0091
    (HB0169)
State Board of Elections - Open Meetings - Video Streaming and Recording (State Board of Elections Transparency Act)Senator KaganIn the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 2:15 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2017 - 2:15 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0253
    (HB0438)
Legislative Transparency Act of 2017PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0450 / CH0526
    (HB0880 / CH0525)
Open Meetings Act - Annual Reporting Requirement, Web Site Postings, and TrainingSenator MannoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 526Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0571 / CH0017
    (HB0909)
Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection ActSenator MiddletonEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 17Finance
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0884 / CH0018
    (HB1134 / CH0781)
Maryland Financial Consumer Protection CommissionSenator RosapepeEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 18Finance
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCommercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB0910 / CH0509
    (HB1541)
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - OperationsSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 509Finance
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:17 P.M.