Open Government

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 6

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0076 / CH0368Baltimore County Board of Education - Education Transparency ActBaltimore County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 368Ways and Means
2/1/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB0352
    (SB0295)
Transparency Act of 2018SpeakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
2/19/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB0704General Assembly - Live and Archived Video Streaming of MeetingsDelegate SzeligaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
2/26/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0295
    (HB0352)
Transparency Act of 2018PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0396 / CH0546Open Meetings Act - Training - ApplicationSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 546Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0984General Provisions - Open Meetings Act - Application to Governor's Cabinet and Governor's Executive CouncilSenator ZuckerIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 11, 2018 4:29 P.M.