Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Statutes Text

Article - Environment




§6–820.

    (a)    Except as provided in subsection (b) of this section, an owner of an affected property shall give to the tenant of the affected property a notice, prepared by the Department, of the tenant’s rights under §§ 6–817 and 6–819 of this subtitle, according to the following schedule:

        (1)    At least 25% of the owner’s affected properties by May 25, 1996;

        (2)    At least 50% of the owner’s affected properties by August 25, 1996;

        (3)    At least 75% of the owner’s affected properties by November 25, 1996; and

        (4)    100% of the owner’s affected properties by February 25, 1997.

    (b)    On or after February 24, 1996, an owner of an affected property shall give to the tenant of the affected property a notice, prepared by the Department, of the tenant’s rights under §§ 6–817 and 6–819 of this subtitle upon the execution of a lease or the inception of a tenancy.

    (c)    An owner of an affected property shall give to the tenant of the affected property a notice, prepared by the Department, of the tenant’s rights under §§ 6–817 and 6–819 of this subtitle at least every 2 years after last giving the notice to the tenant.

    (d)    The owner shall include, with the notice of the tenant’s rights that is provided to a tenant under this section upon the execution of a lease or the inception of a tenancy, a copy of the current verified inspection certificate for the affected property prepared under § 6–818 of this subtitle.

    (e)    (1)    Notice given under this section shall be written, and shall be sent by:

            (i)    Certified mail, return receipt requested; or

            (ii)    A verifiable method approved by the Department.

        (2)    When giving notice to a tenant under this section, the owner shall provide documentation of the notice to the Department in a manner acceptable to the Department.

        (3)    A notice required to be given to a tenant under this section shall be sent to a party or parties identified as the lessee in a written lease in effect for an affected property or, if there is no written lease, the party or parties to whom the property was rented.

    (f)    A person who has acquired, or will acquire, an affected property shall give the notice required under this section to the tenant of the affected property:

        (1)    Before transfer of legal title; or

        (2)    Within 15 days following transfer of legal title.