Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Statutes Text

Article - Labor and Employment




§3–413.

    (a)    (1)    In this section the following words have the meanings indicated.

        (2)    “Employer” includes a governmental unit.

        (3)    “Small employer” means an employer that employs 14 or fewer employees.

    (b)    Except as provided in subsection (d) of this section and §§ 3–413.1 and 3–414 of this subtitle, each employer shall pay:

        (1)    to each employee who is subject to both the federal Act and this subtitle, at least the greater of:

            (i)    the minimum wage for that employee under the federal Act; or

            (ii)    the State minimum wage set under subsection (c) of this section; and

        (2)    to each other employee who is subject to this subtitle, at least the greater of:

            (i)    the highest minimum wage under the federal Act; or

            (ii)    the State minimum wage set under subsection (c) of this section.

    (c)    (1)    Subject to § 3–413.1 of this subtitle and except as provided in paragraph (2) of this subsection, the State minimum wage rate is:

            (i)    for the 12–month period beginning July 1, 2017, $9.25 per hour;

            (ii)    for the 18–month period beginning July 1, 2018, $10.10 per hour;

            (iii)    for the 12–month period beginning January 1, 2020, $11.00 per hour;

            (iv)    for the 12–month period beginning January 1, 2021, $11.75 per hour;

            (v)    for the 12–month period beginning January 1, 2022, $12.50 per hour;

            (vi)    for the 12–month period beginning January 1, 2023, $13.25 per hour;

            (vii)    for the 12–month period beginning January 1, 2024, $14.00 per hour; and

            (viii)    beginning January 1, 2025, $15.00 per hour.

        (2)    Subject to § 3–413.1 of this subtitle, the State minimum wage rate for a small employer is:

            (i)    for the 18–month period beginning July 1, 2018, $10.10 per hour;

            (ii)    for the 12–month period beginning January 1, 2020, $11.00 per hour;

            (iii)    for the 12–month period beginning January 1, 2021, $11.60 per hour;

            (iv)    for the 12–month period beginning January 1, 2022, $12.20 per hour;

            (v)    for the 12–month period beginning January 1, 2023, $12.80 per hour;

            (vi)    for the 12–month period beginning January 1, 2024, $13.40 per hour;

            (vii)    for the 12–month period beginning January 1, 2025, $14.00 per hour;

            (viii)    for the 6–month period beginning January 1, 2026, $14.60 per hour; and

            (ix)    beginning July 1, 2026, $15.00 per hour.

    (d)    An employer may pay an employee a wage that equals a rate of 85% of the State minimum wage established under this section if the employee is under the age of 18 years.