Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Statutes Text

Article - State Personnel and Pensions




§25–201.

    (a)    Except as provided in subsection (b) of this section, this subtitle applies only to:

        (1)    correctional officers serving in any of the first six job classifications;

        (2)    security attendants at Clifton T. Perkins Hospital Center;

        (3)    a detention center officer employed by a participating governmental unit that on or after July 1, 2006, has elected to participate in the Correctional Officers’ Retirement System;

        (4)    an individual serving as a correctional dietary, maintenance, laundry, or supply officer;

        (5)    an individual serving as a Maryland Correctional Enterprises officer, officer trainee, plant supervisor, plant manager, or regional manager;

        (6)    a correctional officer serving as a security chief, a facility administrator, an assistant warden, or a warden who:

            (i)    begins employment in that position on or after July 1, 2014; or

            (ii)    is serving in that position on June 30, 2014, and elects to transfer to the Correctional Officers’ Retirement System from:

                1.    the Employees’ Pension System on or before December 31, 2014; or

                2.    the Employees’ Retirement System on or before December 31, 2015;

        (7)    an individual serving as a correctional case management specialist, supervisor, or manager on or after July 1, 2016;

        (8)    an individual serving as a parole and probation agent, supervisor, or regional administrator on or after July 1, 2017;

        (9)    an individual serving as a Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services employee in one of the following positions on or after July 1, 2017:

            (i)    an alcohol and drug:

                1.    associate counselor, counselor lead, counselor provisional, or counselor supervisor;

                2.    professional counselor, counselor provisional, or counselor supervisor; or

                3.    supervised counselor or counselor provisional;

            (ii)    a mental health professional counselor, graduate professional counselor, professional counselor advanced, or professional supervisor;

            (iii)    a psychologist, psychology associate, or psychology associate doctorate;

            (iv)    a social worker, social worker advanced, social worker supervisor, or social work regional supervisor; or

            (v)    a recreation officer or supervisor;

        (10)    an individual serving as a Department of Juvenile Services employee in one of the following positions on or after July 1, 2018:

            (i)    a community detention officer or community detention supervisor;

            (ii)    a youth transportation officer, youth transportation officer lead, youth transportation officer supervisor, or youth transportation officer trainee;

            (iii)    a resident advisor, resident advisor lead, resident advisor supervisor, or resident advisor trainee; or

            (iv)    a youth recreation specialist; and

        (11)    an individual serving as a Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services employee in one of the following positions on or after July 1, 2018:

            (i)    a parole and probation assistant regional administrator;

            (ii)    a psychology services chief;

            (iii)    a correctional maintenance officer supervisor;

            (iv)    a correctional maintenance officer manager;

            (v)    a correctional maintenance services officer;

            (vi)    a correctional maintenance services supervisor; or

            (vii)    a correctional maintenance services manager.

    (b)    This subtitle does not apply to:

        (1)    an employee of the Baltimore City Jail as of June 30, 1991, who:

            (i)    became an employee of the Baltimore City Detention Center on July 1, 1991; and

            (ii)    did not elect to become a member of the Correctional Officers’ Retirement System on that date;

        (2)    a detention center officer employed by a participating governmental unit as a local detention center officer on the effective date of participation on or after July 1, 2006, who did not elect to become a member of the Correctional Officers’ Retirement System within 6 months of the effective date of participation; or

        (3)    a correctional officer serving as a security chief, a facility administrator, an assistant warden, or a warden who is in that position on June 30, 2014, and does not elect to transfer membership to the Correctional Officers’ Retirement System from:

            (i)    the Employees’ Pension System on or before December 31, 2014; or

            (ii)    the Employees’ Retirement System on or before December 31, 2015.