Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Newborn Screening Program Fund - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegates O'Donnell, S. Howard, Hammen, Pendergrass, Angel, Barron, Bromwell, Cullison, Hayes, Kelly, Kipke, Krebs, McDonough, McMillan, Miele, Morgan, Morhaim, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Sample-Hughes, West, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 56
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Newborn Screening Program Fund; requiring the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene to administer the Fund; requiring the Secretary to pay specified fees to the Comptroller; requiring the Comptroller to distribute specified fees to the Newborn Screening Program Fund; requiring interest earnings of the Fund to be credited to the Fund; exempting the Fund from a specified provision of law requiring interest on State money in special funds to accrue to the General Fund of the State; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0467
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
11/17/2014
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
1/14/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2015
Legislative Date
1/21/2015
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2015
Legislative Date
2/24/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/25/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {746285/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/25/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/02/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2015
Legislative Date
4/14/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 56
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/05/2015 11/17/2014 Pre-filed
House 1/05/2015 1/14/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/21/2015 1/21/2015 Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/23/2015 2/24/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/25/2015 2/25/2015 Favorable with Amendments {746285/1 Report Adopted 31
House 2/25/2015 2/25/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31
House 2/27/2015 2/27/2015 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 33
Senate 3/02/2015 3/02/2015 First Reading Finance 33
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2015 4/01/2015 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 55
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 56
House 4/06/2015 3/31/2015 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 4/14/2015 4/14/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 56
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-111, 13-113 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM