Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Death Penalty Repeal and Appropriation from Savings to Aid Survivors of Homicide Victims
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Rosenberg, Anderson, Arora, Aumann, Barnes, Barve, Bobo, Branch, Braveboy, Burns, Cane, Cardin, Carr, Carter, Conaway, Cullison, Dumais, Feldman, Frick, Frush, Gaines, Gilchrist, Glenn, Griffith, Gutierrez, Guzzone, Haynes, Healey, Hixson, Holmes, Howard, Hubbard, Hucker, Ivey, Jones, Kaiser, A. Kelly, Kramer, Lafferty, Lee, Love, Luedtke, McIntosh, A. Miller, Mitchell, Mizeur, Morhaim, Murphy, Nathan-Pulliam, Niemann, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Proctor, Reznik, B. Robinson, S. Robinson, Simmons, Summers, Tarrant, F. Turner, V. Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, A. Washington, M. Washington, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the death penalty; repealing procedures and requirements related to the death penalty; providing that in specified cases in which the State has filed a notice to seek a sentence of death, the notice shall be considered withdrawn and it shall be considered a notice to seek a sentence of life imprisonment without the possibility of parole under specified circumstances; providing that specified persons serving life sentences are not eligible for Patuxent Institution under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0276
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/25/2013 1/25/2013 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 2/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-901 through 3-909, 4-101, 4-305, 6-112, 7-301, 7-601 )
(   12-307, 3-8A-03, 3-8A-06, 8-404, 8-420, 9-204 )
(   11-404, 11-916, 3-105, 3-106, 3-107, 4-204, 5-101, 7-101, 7-103, 7-107, 7-201 through 7-204, 8-108 )
(   14-101, 2-103, 2-201, 2-202, 2-301, 2-303, 2-304, 2-305, 2-401 )
(   16-812 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM