Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
St. Mary’s County – Property Tax Credit for Improvements to Commercial Real Property and Transfer Tax Sunset Extension
Sponsored by
St. Mary's County Delegation
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 199
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the governing body of St. Mary's County to grant, by law, a property tax credit against the county property tax imposed on commercial real property that is located in an eligible area of the county and that has been improved on or after July 1, 2020; prohibiting the tax credit from exceeding 25% of the county property tax; requiring the governing body of St. Mary's County to define, by law, certain eligibility criteria; applying certain provisions of the Act to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2020; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {745965/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 199
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - St. Mary's County - Property Tax Credit - Improvements to Commercial Real Property
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/12/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable with Amendments {745965/1 Adopted 47
House 3/12/2020 3/10/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - St. Mary’s County – Property Tax Credit for Improvements to Commercial Real Property and Transfer Tax Sunset Extension
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 48
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Budget and Taxation 49
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted 51
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed 51
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 51A
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Returned Passed 51
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 199
Text - Chapter - St. Mary’s County – Property Tax Credit for Improvements to Commercial Real Property and Transfer Tax Sunset Extension
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   138-1B., 138-1F. )
Last Updated: 7/6/2020 1:24 PM