Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Housing - Energy-Efficient Homes Construction Loan Program
Sponsored by
Chair, Environmental Matters Committee (By Request - Departmental - Housing and Community Development)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 410
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Energy-Efficient Homes Construction Loan Program; requiring the Department to submit every 6 months beginning January 1, 2015, a report to the General Assembly on regulations adopted to increase participation of minority businesses in the program and outcome of that effort; establishing the Energy-Efficient Homes Construction Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; requiring the State Treasurer to hold the Fund separately and the Comptroller to account for the Fund; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/14/2014
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {690616/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (108-26)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
41A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Special Order until 4/7 (Senator Muse) Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Muse) Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Muse) Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Muse) Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Muse) {953226/1 Rejected
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Glassman) {713222/1 Rejected (17-30)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Muse) {103823/1 Rejected
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Glassman) {823621/1
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Motion Special Order until later today (Senator Glassman) Rejected (18-29)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Glassman) {823621/1 Rejected (16-31)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Muse) {173723/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (43-4)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-3)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 410
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2014 1/29/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/13/2014 2/13/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 2/14/2014 2/14/2014 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/04/2014 3/05/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 3/06/2014 3/06/2014 Favorable with Amendments {690616/1 Report Adopted 42
House 3/06/2014 3/06/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42
House 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 Third Reading Passed (108-26) 43
Senate 3/10/2014 3/07/2014 First Reading Senate Rules 41A
Senate 3/19/2014 3/20/2014 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/21/2014 3/21/2014 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/01/2014 4/02/2014 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Special Order until 4/7 (Senator Muse) Adopted 61
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Special Order until later today (Senator Muse) Adopted 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/29/2014 Special Order until later today (Senator Muse) Adopted 63
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Special Order until later today (Senator Muse) Adopted 64
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Muse) {953226/1 Rejected 65
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Glassman) {713222/1 Rejected (17-30) 65
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Muse) {103823/1 Rejected 65
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Glassman) {823621/1 65
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Motion Special Order until later today (Senator Glassman) Rejected (18-29) 65
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Glassman) {823621/1 Rejected (16-31) 65
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Muse) {173723/1 Adopted 65
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (43-4) 65
House 4/07/2014 4/03/2014 House Concur - Senate Amendments 70
House 4/07/2014 4/03/2014 Third Reading Passed (131-3) 70
House 4/07/2014 4/03/2014 Passed Enrolled 70
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 410
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-2001 through 4-2006 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM