Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pharmacists - Contraceptives - Prescribing and Dispensing
Sponsored by
Delegates Hettleman, Barron, Barkley, B. Barnes, Barve, Clippinger, Ebersole, Frick, Kelly, Korman, Kramer, Lierman, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Queen, Robinson, Rosenberg, Sanchez, Tarlau, Waldstreicher, M. Washington, K. Young, P. Young, R. Lewis, Angel, and Cullison
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 820
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a pharmacist who meets the requirements of State Board of Pharmacy regulations to prescribe and dispense specified contraceptives; requiring the State Board of Pharmacy, on or before September 1, 2018, and in consultation with the State Board of Physicians, the State Board of Nursing, and specified stakeholders to adopt regulations establishing the conditions under which pharmacists may prescribe and dispense contraceptives; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0363
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Pharmacists - Contraceptives - Prescribing and Dispensing
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {656882/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Pharmacists - Contraceptives - Prescribing and Dispensing
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (125-14)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {784931/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-14)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (111-24)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Pharmacists - Contraceptives - Prescribing and Dispensing
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2017
Legislative Date
5/27/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 820
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Pharmacists - Contraceptives - Prescribing and Dispensing
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Pharmacists - Contraceptives - Prescribing and Dispensing
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable with Amendments {656882/1 Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Pharmacists - Contraceptives - Prescribing and Dispensing
House 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Third Reading Passed (125-14) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable with Amendments {784931/1 Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed (33-14) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (111-24) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Pharmacists - Contraceptives - Prescribing and Dispensing
Post Passage 5/27/2017 5/27/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 820
Text - Chapter - Pharmacists - Contraceptives - Prescribing and Dispensing
(   15-101, 15-148 )
(   12-101, 12-511 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page