Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Personnel - Individuals With Disabilities - Hiring Preferences
Sponsored by
Delegate Kramer
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 524
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring an appointing authority to apply a credit of five points on a selection test for specified positions in the State Personnel Management System for an individual with a specified disability; requiring a specified appointing authority for a specified position in the Executive Branch of State government to develop a hiring preference for an individual with a specified disability that is equivalent to the credit applied on a specified selection test; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0818
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-2)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {157473/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-1)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 524
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2016 2/10/2016 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/26/2016 2/29/2016 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 35
House 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Second Reading Passed 35
House 3/03/2016 3/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (137-2) 37
Senate 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 First Reading Finance 37
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable with Amendments {157473/1 Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) 58
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 House Concur - Senate Amendments 64
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (134-1) 64
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Passed Enrolled 64
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 524
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM