Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government – Discrimination and Harassment
Sponsored by
Delegates Kelly, Fraser-Hidalgo, Krimm, Barve, Robinson, Adams, Ali, Angel, Atterbeary, Aumann, Barkley, Barron, Beidle, Brooks, Carey, Carozza, Carr, Cassilly, Chang, Cullison, Ebersole, Fennell, Flanagan, Frick, Frush, Gibson, Gilchrist, Glenn, Grammer, Gutierrez, Hayes, Healey, Hettleman, Hill, Hixson, Holmes, C. Howard, Jackson, Jalisi, Jameson, Kipke, Kittleman, Knotts, Korman, Kramer, Krebs, Lafferty, Lam, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Lierman, Lisanti, Long, Luedtke, McComas, McCray, McIntosh, McKay, McMillan, Miele, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Morgan, Morhaim, Mosby, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Platt, Proctor, Queen, Reilly, Reznik, Rose, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Sanchez, Simonaire, Stein, Sydnor, Tarlau, Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, M. Washington, Wilkins, K. Young, and P. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 525
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the training course that the State Ethics Commission is required to provide for regulated lobbyists and prospective regulated lobbyists; prohibiting a certain State official from unlawfully harassing or discriminating against certain individuals; requiring the Joint Ethics Committee to provide a copy of a certain complaint and notice to the Human Resources Manager of the Department of Legislative Services; requiring the Legislative Policy Committee to update a certain antiharassment policy and include a certain provision; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Rules
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB1138
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Legislative Branch of State Government - Sexual Harassment
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {583221/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {663926/1 (Delegate Healey) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Legislative Branch of State Government - Sexual Harassment
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 12:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {573720/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - State Government – Discrimination and Harassment
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 525
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - State Government – Discrimination and Harassment
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Legislative Branch of State Government - Sexual Harassment
House 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 Hearing 3/05 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {583221/1 Adopted 47
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Floor Amendment {663926/1 (Delegate Healey) Adopted 47
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - Legislative Branch of State Government - Sexual Harassment
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 49
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Rules 48B
Senate 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Hearing 3/30 at 11:00 a.m.
Senate 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Hearing 3/30 at 12:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Rules
Senate 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Senate Rules
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Favorable with Amendments {573720/1 Adopted 62A
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62A
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 63
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 67
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 67
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - State Government – Discrimination and Harassment
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 525
Text - Chapter - State Government – Discrimination and Harassment
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-101, 5-205, 5-508, 5-517, 5-518, 5-518.1, 5-714, 5-714.1 )
(   2-1201, 2-1211, 2-1215, 2-401, 2-407, 2-701, 2-706 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM