Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - School Facilities Surcharge PG 420-13
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 685
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a reduction of the Prince George's County school facilities surcharge for multifamily housing constructed within an approved transit district overlay zone, within one-quarter mile of a Metro station under specified circumstances, or within the Bowie State MARC Station Community Center Designation Area; and establishing an exemption of the school facilities surcharge for studio or efficiency apartments that are located within specified areas under specified circumstances.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Rereferred to Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {550312/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (119-16)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Special Order until p.m. session (Senator Ramirez) Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Special Order until 4/8 (Senator Ramirez) Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Ramirez) Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Peters) Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 685
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/15/2013 2/18/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/05/2013 3/06/2013 Rereferred to Environmental Matters
House 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/22/2013 3/22/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 3/22/2013 3/19/2013 Favorable with Amendments {550312/1 Report Adopted 52
House 3/22/2013 3/19/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Third Reading Passed (119-16) 53
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 52
Senate 3/26/2013 3/26/2013 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/03/2013 4/04/2013 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Favorable 62
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Special Order until p.m. session (Senator Ramirez) Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable 63
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Special Order until 4/8 (Senator Ramirez) Adopted 63
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Favorable 64
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Special Order until later today (Senator Ramirez) Adopted 64
Senate 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Favorable 65
Senate 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Special Order until later today (Senator Peters) Adopted 65
Senate 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Second Reading Passed 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 67
House 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 685
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM