Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Morgan State University - Office of Technology Transfer
Sponsored by
Delegate Oaks
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Board of Regents of Morgan State University to develop and implement a plan to enhance the Office of Technology Transfer at the University; requiring the Maryland Technology Development Corporation, at the request of the Board of Regents, to provide technical assistance to the Office of Technology Transfer; requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation of $1,000,000 to the University for each of fiscal years 2018 through 2020 for specified purposes; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Rules
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1158
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/12/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/12/2016
Action
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate Oaks) Adopted (134-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/12/2016
Action
Referred House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (113-23)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
62
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/15/2016 3/12/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/15/2016 3/12/2016 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate Oaks) Adopted (134-0) 44
House 3/15/2016 3/12/2016 Referred House Rules and Executive Nominations 44
House 3/29/2016 3/29/2016 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 3/30/2016 3/30/2016 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/01/2016 4/01/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 4/01/2016 4/01/2016 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/06/2016 4/07/2016 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 63
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Second Reading Passed 63
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (113-23) 64
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 First Reading Senate Rules 62
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-104.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM