Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority – Youth and Amateur Sports Grants Program and Michael Erin Busch Sports Fund
Sponsored by
Delegate McIntosh
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Youth and Amateur Sports Grants Program to provide grants from the Michael Erin Busch Sports Fund to bring new youth and amateur events to the State and attract sports fans, participants, and tourists; requiring Maryland Sports to implement and administer the Program in a certain manner; requiring the Comptroller to distribute a certain amount of money from the State Lottery Fund to the Michael Erin Busch Sports Fund each fiscal year; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1076
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted (137-0)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted (137-0)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {804063/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-3)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 First Reading Appropriations
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted (137-0) 40
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted (137-0) 40
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Referred Appropriations 40
Text - First - Maryland Stadium Authority - Youth and Amateur Sports Grants Program and Fund
House 3/04/2020 3/04/2020 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {804063/1 Adopted 48
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Maryland Stadium Authority – Youth and Amateur Sports Grants Program and Michael Erin Busch Sports Fund
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (130-3) 49
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Referred Budget and Taxation 50
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Adopted 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Second Reading Passed 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 53C
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Returned Passed 53
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-601,   10-612.1, 10-612.2 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2020 10:23 AM