Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Health Benefit Plans - Special Enrollment Period for Pregnancy
Sponsored by
Senator Lam
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring certain health benefit plans and certain carriers to provide a special enrollment period during which individuals who become pregnant may enroll in a health benefit plan; establishing a 90-day duration for the special enrollment period beginning on the date a pregnancy is confirmed by a health care practitioner; establishing certain effective dates of coverage; requiring the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange to report to certain legislative committees on the use of the special enrollment period by January 1, 2022; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0127
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1038 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/13/2018
Legislative Date
11/13/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2019
Legislative Date
1/28/2019
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/17/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {877479/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/17/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/24/2019
Legislative Date
5/24/2019
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/13/2018 11/13/2018 Pre-filed
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Health Insurance - Health Benefit Plans - Special Enrollment Period for Pregnancy
Senate 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 Hearing 2/06 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/19/2019 3/17/2019 Favorable with Amendments {877479/1 Adopted 49
Senate 3/19/2019 3/17/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
Text - Third - Health Insurance - Health Benefit Plans - Special Enrollment Period for Pregnancy
Senate 3/20/2019 3/18/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 50
House 3/21/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 51A
House 3/26/2019 3/27/2019 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 3/27/2019 3/27/2019 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 60
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 64
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/24/2019 5/24/2019 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter
Senate 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 Veto sustained (0-46)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-1201, 15-1208.1, 15-1316 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM