Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Financial Institutions – Disclosure of Information From Investigations
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor, Licensing and Regulation)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 87
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the denial of certain records of an investigation by the Commissioner of Financial Regulation; authorizing the publication of information concerning a violation of a law, a regulation, a rule, or an order over which the Commissioner has jurisdiction; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/23/2018
Legislative Date
10/23/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {327272/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 87
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/23/2018 10/23/2018 Pre-filed
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Financial Institutions - Examination and Investigation of Licensed Persons - Disclosure of Information
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments {327272/1 Adopted 47A
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Text - Third - Financial Institutions – Disclosure of Information From Investigations
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 48
House 3/19/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Economic Matters 50
House 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 59
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 87
Text - Chapter - Financial Institutions – Disclosure of Information From Investigations
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM