Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Law - Credit Services Businesses - Information Statements
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor, Licensing and Regulation)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 88
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Exempting certain credit services businesses from certain information statement requirements when the credit services business is engaged to obtain an extension of credit for a consumer; requiring credit services businesses engaged in obtaining a credit extension for a consumer to provide the consumer with certain information and a copy of the contract between the credit services business and the consumer before the consumer executes the contract; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/25/2018
Legislative Date
10/25/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Commercial Law - Credit Services Businesses - Information Statements
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {807374/1 Adopted
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Commercial Law - Credit Services Businesses - Information Statements
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/21/2019
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 88
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Commercial Law - Credit Services Businesses - Information Statements
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/25/2018 10/25/2018 Pre-filed
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Commercial Law - Credit Services Businesses - Information Statements
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments {807374/1 Adopted 27
Senate 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 27
Text - Third - Commercial Law - Credit Services Businesses - Information Statements
Senate 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 30
House 2/21/2019 2/21/2019 Referred Economic Matters 32
House 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 59
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 88
Text - Chapter - Commercial Law - Credit Services Businesses - Information Statements
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-1901, 14-1904, 14-1906 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM