Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Regulation – Battery–Charged Fence Security Systems – Regulation
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a local government to require that certain persons who provide battery-charged fence security systems comply with certain laws, require certain persons who operate or install certain security systems to obtain certain registrations or permits, require a certain installer to submit a certain affidavit, and conduct a certain inspection; authorizing a local government to issue a citation under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/22/2020
Legislative Date
10/22/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
18AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/22/2020 10/22/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Finance
Senate 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Business Regulation – Battery–Charged Fence Security Systems – Regulation
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/26/2021 2/16/2021 Favorable Adopted 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2021 2/16/2021 Second Reading Passed 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Business Regulation – Battery–Charged Fence Security Systems – Regulation
Senate 3/02/2021 2/17/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 18AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2021 2/27/2021 Referred Economic Matters 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 3/4/2021 1:53 PM
Click to return on the top page