Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Hemp Farming Program - Expansion - Processing Hemp
Sponsored by
Senator Hester
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding the scope and purpose of the Hemp Farming Program to include monitoring and regulating the processing of hemp; requiring the Department of Agriculture, in consultation with the Governor and the Attorney General, to establish a certain plan for monitoring and regulating the processing of hemp in the State; requiring the Department of Agriculture to establish a procedure for licensing the processing of hemp in accordance with the plan; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Hemp Farming Program - Expansion - Processing Hemp
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Hemp Farming Program - Expansion - Processing Hemp
Senate 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/04/2020 3/04/2020 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 6/9/2020 1:36 PM