Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Local Tax Relief for Working Families Act of 2020
Sponsored by
Senator Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing to 3.5% the maximum rate a county may impose on an individual's Maryland taxable income for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2021; requiring a county, with regard to any increase to its county income tax rate that is effective on or after January 1, 2022, to impose the increase on an income bracket basis; requiring a county that imposes the county income tax on an income bracket basis to set, by ordinance or resolution, certain income brackets; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1494
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Local Tax Relief for Working Families Act of 2020
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Local Tax Relief for Working Families Act of 2020
Senate 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/12/2020 2:48 PM